Bauer, Richard et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richard Bauer, Vaughn Frye, Joe Delfosse, Daniel McGill and UFCW, Local Union 538
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT granting attorney fees in favor of Kraft Foods Global, Inc. against United Food and Commercial Workers Local Union 538 and counsel for plaintiffs, Arellano & Phebus, S.C., in the amount of $99,587.00. (PAO/lak) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/2/2013. (llj)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Kraft Foods Global, Inc. dismissing the case. Signed by Clerk of Court Peter Oppeneer on 8/13/12. (krj)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving proposed class notice with amendments. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/23/12. (krj)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER allowing plaintiffs until 1/9/2012 to supplement record in support of amended motion for class certification; response due 1/16/2012. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/3/2012. (llj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer, Richard et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bauer
Represented By: Douglas Phebus
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Frye
Represented By: Douglas Phebus
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Delfosse
Represented By: Douglas Phebus
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McGill
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Represented By: Douglas Phebus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW, Local Union 538
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Represented By: Douglas Phebus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Represented By: Bernard J. Bobber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?