40 Days for Life of Wausau et al v. Illick, Ralph et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Theresa Whitaker, Janet Kraimer-Nichols and Mary Litschauer
Defendant: Ralph Illick, Marathon County Public Library, Tim Gierl, Audrey Ascher, Gary Beastrom, Ken Day, Alison Morrow, Katie Rosenberg, Scott Winch, Marathon County, Wisconsin and Keith Langenhahn
Case Number: 3:2011cv00231
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case with prejudice per stipulation of parties. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/12/2011. (llj)
April 12, 2011 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lubinsky, Lori)
April 8, 2011 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (llj)
April 7, 2011 12 ANSWER by Defendants Audrey Ascher, Gary Beastrom, Ken Day, Tim Gierl, Ralph Illick, Keith Langenhahn, Marathon County Public Library, Marathon County, Wisconsin, Alison Morrow, Katie Rosenberg, Scott Winch. (Wilson, Julie)
April 5, 2011 Action Requested: Completion of CM/ECF Registration by Attorneys Peter Breen, Thomas Olp and David L. Heaton is required prior to admission pro hac vice. (llj)
March 31, 2011 Notice of Action: Hearing set for 4/1/2011 at 3:00 pm has been canceled. (llj/bbc)
March 31, 2011 11 Status Report by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer-Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker advising the court that the hearing set for 4/1/2011 may be canceled. (Attachments: # 1 Ltr from Atty. Corbett dated 3-31-11) (Lubinsky, Lori) Modified text on 3/31/2011 (llj).
March 31, 2011 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Audrey Ascher, Gary Beastrom, Ken Day, Tim Gierl, Ralph Illick, Keith Langenhahn, Marathon County Public Library, Marathon County, Wisconsin, Alison Morrow, Katie Rosenberg, Scott Winch (Pollen, Raymond)
March 31, 2011 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Remzy Bitar for Defendants Audrey Ascher, Gary Beastrom, Ken Day, Tim Gierl, Ralph Illick, Keith Langenhahn, Marathon County Public Library, Marathon County, Wisconsin, Alison Morrow, Katie Rosenberg, Scott Winch (Bitar, Remzy)
March 30, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2011 at 03:00 PM. Plaintiffs to serve all filings on defendants, including this order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/30/2011. (llj)
March 30, 2011 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order on Dispositive Motions. (llj)
March 30, 2011 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (llj)
March 30, 2011 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 30, 2011 6 Motion to Admit Peter C. Breen, Thomas Olp and David L. Heaton Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker. (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 30, 2011 5 Disregard; duplicate of entry 3. Modified on 3/30/2011 (llj).
March 30, 2011 4 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker re: 2 Motion for TRO filed by 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker, Janet Kraimer Nichols (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 30, 2011 3 Brief in support of 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, janet Kraimer Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker. Requested to be refiled as docket entry 5. Modified on 3/30/2011 (jas). Modified on 3/30/2011 to correct entry; document is a brief in support. (llj).
March 30, 2011 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer Nichols, Mary Litschauer, Theresa Whitaker. (Lubinsky, Lori)
March 30, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Injunction & Other Relief against Audrey Ascher, Gary Beastrom, Ken Day, Tim Gierl, Ralph Illick, Keith Langenhahn, Marathon County, Marathon County Public Library, Alison Morrow, Katie Rosenberg, Scott Winch. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0758-735306.), filed by Theresa Whitaker, Mary Litschauer, 40 Days for Life of Wausau, Janet Kraimer Nichols. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Library Meeting Room Policy, # 2 Exhibit B - ALA Bill of Rights, # 3 Exhibit C - 10-day agenda, # 4 Exhibit D - Search results under keyword 'abortion', # 5 Exhibit E - Ltr from Plfs' counsel dated 3-25-11, # 6 Exhibit F - Ltr from Marathon Co Corp Counsel dated 3-29-11, # 7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lubinsky, Lori) Modified exhibit numbers on 4/1/2011 (llj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 40 Days for Life of Wausau et al v. Illick, Ralph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 40 Days for Life of Wausau
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Whitaker
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Kraimer-Nichols
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Litschauer
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Illick
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon County Public Library
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Gierl
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Ascher
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Beastrom
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Day
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Morrow
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Rosenberg
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Winch
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon County, Wisconsin
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Langenhahn
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?