Neri, Quincy v. Monroe, Melinda et al
Plaintiff: Quincy M. Neri
Defendant: Eric Ferguson, Lesley Sager, Melinda Monroe, Steven Larson, Architectural Building Arts, Inc., University of Wisconsin-Madison, Linda Hughes, Fritz Schomburg and Amy Radspinner
Case Number: 3:2011cv00429
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying as moot 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 238 Motion for Hearing. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants Architectural Building Arts, Monroe, Larson, Sager and Ferguson and to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/25/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/lak). (jef),(ps)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL as to defendant Fritz Schomberg with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/19/2012. (jef),(ps)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing 1 , 4 , 5 , 6 , 7 Complaints without prejudice to plaintiff's refiling an amended complaint that encompasses all of her claims. Amended Complaint due 8/12/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/25/2011. (jef),(ps)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 175.00 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/17/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neri, Quincy v. Monroe, Melinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Architectural Building Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Wisconsin-Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Schomburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Radspinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy M. Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?