Lane, Ronald v. Pollard, William
Petitioner: Ronald P. Lane
Respondent: William Pollard
Case Number: 3:2011cv00458
Filed: June 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER notifying the Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit of petitioner's failure to pay the entire assessed amount of his appeal filing fee. Petitioner has submitted only $13.45 of the $208.73 initial partial payment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/5/2011. (jef),(ps)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Initial partial appeal filing fee of $ 208.73 assessed. Initial partial appeal filing fee due 11/10/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/21/2011. (jef),(ps)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that a decision whether petitioner may proceed in forma pauperison appeal is stayed. Petitioner may have until October 18, 2011 in which to submit a six-month trust fund account statement. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/26/2011. (jef),(ps)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered denying the petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/2/11. (elc),(ps)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dismissing petitioner's 1 claim that his due process rights were violated because he was not present at his restitution hearing. Supplement to petition due 8/12/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/22/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane, Ronald v. Pollard, William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald P. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Pollard
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?