Garner, Oscar v. Sumnicht, Paul et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Defendant: Paul Sumnicht, Belinda Schrubbe, Cynthia Thorpe and Mary Gorske
Case Number: 3:2011cv00829
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER that Garner's request for court intervention in this matter is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/7/2016. (jef),(ps)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER appointing Donald K. Schott to represent Plaintiff Oscar Garner. The court will schedule a status conference to set the schedule for the remainder of proceedings in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2014. (nln),(ps)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Assessing Initial Partial Appeal Filing Fee of $ 17.75 Initial partial appeal filing fee due 11/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/15/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Trust Fund Account Statement due 10/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/2013. (elc),(ps)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Mary Gorske, Belinda Schrubbe, Paul Sumnicht, Cynthia Thorpe dismissing this case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff's 25 motion for preliminary injunction. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that plaintiff Oscar Garner has until August 28, 2012 to supplement his proposed findings of fact in support of his motion for preliminary injunction. Defendants will have until September 7, 2012 to respond with additional evidence and facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/14/12. (elc),(ps)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 11.67 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/23/2011. (jef),(ps)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 1/5/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 12/14/2011. (jef: cc: plaintiff),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner, Oscar v. Sumnicht, Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sumnicht
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Thorpe
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Gorske
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?