Anderson, Jill v. Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jill Anderson
Defendant: Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC, Todd Gibney and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2012cv00089
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT in favor of Jill Anderson against Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC, Vincent Cignarale in the total amount of $ 7964.94. (rep)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/24/14. (rep)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER giving plaintiff until 1/27/14 to complete settlement. In-person status conference set for 1/29/14 at 8:30 am. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/7/14. (rep)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Status Conference. Default Hearing as to defendant Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC set for 1/8/2014 at 8:30 AM. If plaintiff has not served the individual defendants at that time, judgment will be entered against Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC and the suit will be dismissed against the two individual defendants. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/4/2013. (arw)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on telephone status conference. Default Hearing set for 12/4/2013 at 08:30 AM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/10/13. (rep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, Jill v. Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Vincent P. Cignarale, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Gibney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Anderson
Represented By: Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?