Rivera, Natanael v. Schultz, Machael et al
Plaintiff: Natanael Rivera
Defendant: Machael Schultz, Minning, Peterson, George Jimenez, Pete Erickson, Macheal Beanen, John Doe 1-12, Tomes Compball, Commeing, Numeke, Rouse, Tingly and Sarah Cooper
Case Number: 3:2012cv00240
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 113 plaintiff's motion to correct the record. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/21/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting plaintiff Natanael Rivera's leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, granting 106 Motion for Transcripts. Plaintiff may have until December 26, 2013, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $0.50. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/16/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants George J. Jimenez, Samuel Menning, Lawrence Peterson, Michael Schultz dismissing this case. (BBC / PAO). (jef),(ps)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying plaintiff's 88 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 86 motion for defendants to provide plaintiff with records and documents for trial; denying 89 motion for sanctions; denying 92 request for witnesses. No later than November 12, 2013, defendants Michael Schultz, Samuel Menning, Lawrence Peterson and George Jimenez are directed to respond to plaintiff's September 20, 2013 discovery requests or show cause why they should not be required to do so. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; denying 70 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/15/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying plaintiff's 53 , 69 Motions to Compel; denying 66 motion for extension of legal loan; granting plaintiff's 68 motion to appear in street clothes at trial provided that plaintiff arranges for his own street clothes to b e transferred to the federal courthouse by 8 a.m. on November 12, 2013. Plaintiff's motion for the court to arrange a phone call regarding his street clothes, dkt. 68 , is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/9/2013. (jef),(ps)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER may have until June 25, 2012, to identify for the court whether he wishes to proceed with his " 1 Verified Complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983" or his " 2 Amended Verified Complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983" under the number assigned to this case and whether to pursue the other case under a separate case number. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/11/2012. (jef),(ps)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.01 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/16/2012. (jef),(ps)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 4/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/5/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera, Natanael v. Schultz, Machael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natanael Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machael Schultz
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minning
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jimenez
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Erickson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macheal Beanen
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomes Compball
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commeing
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numeke
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouse
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tingly
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Cooper
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?