Stewart, Glendale v. Shinseki, Eric et al
Plaintiff: Glendale Stewart
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki, Employee Equal Opportunity Commission (EEOC) and America Federation of Government Employees Union (AFGE)
Case Number: 3:2012cv00337
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 48:1985
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: typographical error in 9 order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/21/2012. (jef),(ps)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that plaintiff Glendale Stewart's complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claim against defendant Erik Shinseki is DISMISSED under the doctrine of claim preclusion; plaintiff's claim against defendant American Federation of Governme nt Employees is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction; plaintiff's claim against the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission is DISMISSED for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/19/2012. (jef),(ps)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/14/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart, Glendale v. Shinseki, Eric et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendale Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Equal Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Federation of Government Employees Union (AFGE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?