Vue, Kong v. State of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Kong Pheng Vue
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2012cv00441
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing plaintiff's 1 complaint without prejdice. Amended complaint due 10/25/2012. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/25/2012. (jef),(ps)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/11/2012. (jef),(ps)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit amended financial affidavit. Amended Financial Affidavit due 7/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vue, Kong v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kong Pheng Vue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?