Adell, Mark v. Smith, Judy et al
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Adell
Defendant: Judy Smith, Cathy Jess and Colleen Janikowski
Case Number: 3:2012cv00452
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/21/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff Mark Anthony Adell's request for leave to proceed and dismissing this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.82 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 8/28/2012.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/6/2012. (jef),(ps)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that plaintiff is granted an extension of time to submit a trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 8/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/20/2012. (jef),(ps)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 7/18/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adell, Mark v. Smith, Judy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Adell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Smith
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Janikowski
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?