Mutawakkil, Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru v. Geri et al
Plaintiff: Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru Mutawakkil
Defendant: Geri, Patten, M. Taylor, Johnson, McDaniels, Borsen, Kussmaul, Peter Huibregtse, Brian Kool, A. Dunbar, Ellen Ray, Gilberg, Burton Cox, Mary Miller, Cynthia Thorpe, Jane Doe #1 and Jane/John Doe #2
Case Number: 3:2012cv00816
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER that the requests filed by plaintiff Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru Mutawakkil, also known as Norman Green, for an additional extension of time to file summary judgment materials, dkt. ## 130 and 137 , are DENIED. Plaintiff's alternative request to dismiss the case without prejudice is GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/19/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying as moot 93 Motion to Compel; denying 95 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 96 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's motion to compel the production of documents sent from plaintiff's mother that were confiscated by prison st aff, dkt. 95 , is GRANTED IN PART. No later than March 14, 2014, defendants should do one of the following for each of the 16 documents identified in Section II of this opinion. Plaintiff's requests to extend the deadline for filing dispositiv e motions to June or July 2014, to appoint counsel and to appoint an expert are DENIED. Plaintiff may have until April 10, 2014 to file his response to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants may have until April 21, 2014 to file their reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/7/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that plaintiff Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru Mutawakkil's complaint is DISMISSED as to his state law claims that defendants Robert Patten, Joan Gerl, Thomas Taylor, Jeremy McDaniel and Leonard Johnson committed the torts of assault, battery and intentional infliction of emotional distress during the alleged use of force and strip search that occurred in November 2007. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/24/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel; denying 84 Motion to Compel; denying as unnecessary 85 Motion to prevent the defense from obstructing and interfering with plaintiff's ability to prosecute this action; denying as moot 86 Motion to Strike; granting 89 Motion to filed an amended expert disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/20/2014. (jef),(ps)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 34 motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendantsJames Boisen and Peter Huibregtse. Defendant Boisen is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 60 Motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying plaintiff's 29 motion for an order of protection of legal documents, exhibits, grievance and medical documents in this action. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/31/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying plaintiff's 7 motion to join defendants and claims. Plaintiff may have until March 11, 2013, to identify for the court whether he wishes to proceed with lawsuits 1 through 10. Plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED as to defendant Mary Miller. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that plaintiff Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru Mutawkkil, also known as Norman Green, may have until February 11, 2013, to file a proposed amended complaint as described in this order. If plaintiff does not respond by that date, I will screen the complaint without reference to Mary Miller, the Doe defendants, Christian Beerkircher, Kelly Trumm and anyone else who is not included in both the caption and the body of the complaint. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/28/2013. (jef),(ps)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER assessing initial partial filing fee of $ 8.04. Initial partial filing fee due 12/31/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/5/2012. (elc),(ps)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/19/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutawakkil, Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru v. Geri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Atum-Ra Uhuru Mutawakkil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geri
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patten
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Taylor
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniels
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borsen
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kussmaul
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Huibregtse
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kool
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dunbar
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Ray
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberg
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton Cox
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Miller
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Thorpe
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?