Jacobs, Dianne v. Owens-Illinois Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dianne Jacobs
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc., Rapid American Corporation and Weyerhauser Company
Cross_claimant: Rapid American Corporation
Cross_defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc. and Weyerhauser Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00899
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2016 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 284 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 292 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/5/2016. (arw)
February 19, 2016 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 164 Motion in Limine; granting 199 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Strike; denying 262 Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Authenti cated; denying as moot 259 Motion to Take Deposition of David B. Allen; denying as moot 200 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 226 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. Plaintiff may have until 2/29/2016 to advise the court as to the status of her claims against the other named defendants. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/19/2016. (arw)
June 4, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 64 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 106 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part defendant Weyerhaeuser's 107 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/3/2015. (kwf)
June 2, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company's 45 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting Plaintiff Diane Jacobs' 52 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/2/2015. (kwf)
June 5, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed.. Signed by Kathryn H. Vratil, Acting Chairman on 6/5/13. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs, Dianne v. Owens-Illinois Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Jacobs
Represented By: Michael P. Cascino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Edward M. Casmere
Represented By: Matthew John Fischer
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Represented By: Mark Russell Feldmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhauser Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Rapid American Corporation
Represented By: Mark Russell Feldmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Edward M. Casmere
Represented By: Matthew John Fischer
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weyerhauser Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?