Johnson, Lorenzo v. Wall, Edward et al

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Johnson
Defendant: Edward F. Wall, Deirdre Morgan, Cathy A. Jess, William Pollard and Greff
Case Number: 3:2013cv00113
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
December 17, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 & 35 Motions for Reconsideration; denying as moot 47 Motion to Stay; denying 15 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 19 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk of court to enter judgment in defendants' favor and close the case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/17/2015. (mfh),(ps)
March 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 133.96 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 3/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 3/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Lorenzo v. Wall, Edward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Wall
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deirdre Morgan
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy A. Jess
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greff
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?