Johnson, Heather v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Heather Johnson
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00144
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 Motion to Strike; denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 130 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23; denying as moot 137 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/14. (jat)
August 8, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/7/2013. (voc)
September 20, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Submission of Material Outside of Pleadings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 09/20/2013. (bgw)
September 30, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/30/13. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Heather v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Johnson
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By: Barbara A. Neider
Represented By: Adam Jay Kaiser
Represented By: John Michael Aerni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.