Dye, John v. Bartow, Byran et al

Plaintiff: John L. Dye, Jr.
Defendant: Byran Bartow, Mary Klemz, Larry Jenkins, Robert Humphreys, Cathy Jess, Thomas Michlowski, Barbara Waedekin, Gaanan and John Doe(s)
Case Number: 3:2013cv00284
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 motion for assistance in recruiting counsel; denying 60 Plaintiff's objection to the substitution of defendant; denying 61 motion to dismiss; and granting 65 motion to modify the remaining schedule. Plaintiff may have until June 10, 2016, to sign the modified medical authorization form or to explain why he refuses to sign it. The schedule is amended as reflected within this order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/25/2016. (jef),(ps)
March 4, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment for plaintiff's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies; denying defendants' 48 motion for summary judgment following plaintiff's failure to meet the original response deadline; granting plaintiff's 49 motion for an extension of time to submit his response to defendants' exhaustion motion; granting 54 , 55 motions to amend the schedule. The schedule is amended as reflected within this order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/4/2016. (jef),(ps)
March 7, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff John Dye may have until March 28, 2014 to submit an amended complaint more fully detailing his Eighth Amendment claims. If Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/7/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the July 15, 2013 judgment in this case, dkt. # 11 , is GRANTED and the judgment is VACATED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on his appeal, dkt. # 17 , is GRANTED. The court will await the court of appeals' disposition of plaintiff's appeal before proceeding further in this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/19/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff leave to proceed and dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dye, John v. Bartow, Byran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Dye, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byran Bartow
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Klemz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Michlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Waedekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?