Johnson, Maurice v. Larson-Smith, Karen et al

Plaintiff: Maurice A. Johnson
Defendant: Karen Larson-Smith, Frodin, Nicholas Dr. Buhr, Harris, Dawn Laurent, Dahlia Suliene and Karen Anderson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00309
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the clerk's office enter Megan Senatori, Deborah Meiners and Laura Davis of the law firm of DeWitt Ross & Stevens as plaintiff's pro bono counsel of record and to set this case for a scheduling conference in July 2015, as the court's schedule allows. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/17/2015. (jef),(ps)
June 16, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 41 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply; denying as moot 45 Motion to Stay; granting 25 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. All deadlines in this case are STRUCK pending recruitment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/15/2015. (jef),(ps)
May 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 46.75 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/8/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Maurice v. Larson-Smith, Karen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Larson-Smith
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frodin
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Dr. Buhr
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Laurent
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dahlia Suliene
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Anderson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?