Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. et al v. Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians et al
Plaintiff: Godfrey & Kahn, S.C., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., LDF Acquisition, LLC, Saybrook Fund Investors, LLC, Stifel Financial Corp. and Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.
Defendant: Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians and Lake of the Torches Economic Development Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00372
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Vilas
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE: 160 Stipulation to Exhibits for Record of Preliminary Injunction Hearing and 162 Motion to Admit Exhibits into the Evidentiary Record of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/16/2014. (voc)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER on Motions in Limine: Granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 108 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion in Li mine ; denying 110 Motion in Limine ; denying 111 Motion in Limine ; denying 112 Motion in Limine ; denying 113 Motion in Limine. The Preliminary Injunction hearing will take place on 3/14/2014 at 8:30 am. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/4/2014. (voc)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Dismiss by defendants. Injunctive Hearing set for 11/26/2013 at 8:30 AM. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/28/2013. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. et al v. Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Timothy Michael Hansen
Represented By: Vanya S. Hogen
Represented By: Jessica Intermill
Represented By: Paul Ryan Jacquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake of the Torches Economic Development Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Michael Hansen
Represented By: Vanya S. Hogen
Represented By: Jessica Intermill
Represented By: Paul Ryan Jacquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.
Represented By: James R. Clark
Represented By: Eric G. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel R. Fine
Represented By: Rami Naji Fakhouri
Represented By: Charles Samuel Bergen
Represented By: Mark F. Foley
Represented By: Laura Kathleen McNally
Represented By: Heidi L. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LDF Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Heidi L. Vogt
Represented By: Laura Kathleen McNally
Represented By: Mark F. Foley
Represented By: Daniel R. Fine
Represented By: Rami Naji Fakhouri
Represented By: Charles Samuel Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saybrook Fund Investors, LLC
Represented By: Heidi L. Vogt
Represented By: Laura Kathleen McNally
Represented By: Mark F. Foley
Represented By: Daniel R. Fine
Represented By: Rami Naji Fakhouri
Represented By: Charles Samuel Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stifel Financial Corp.
Represented By: David J. Turek
Represented By: Daniel J. Kennedy
Represented By: Beth Ermatinger Hanan
Represented By: Brian George Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Turek
Represented By: Daniel J. Kennedy
Represented By: Beth Ermatinger Hanan
Represented By: Brian George Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?