Smith, Derrick v. Mergendahl, Paul et al
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Smith
Defendant: Marathon Co. Jail Guards (John Doe), Melee Thao, Paul Mergendahl and John & Jane Doe Medical Staff
Case Number: 3:2013cv00591
Filed: August 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.60 assessed. (Initial partial filing fee due 10/21/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/30/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 9/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, Derrick v. Mergendahl, Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Co. Jail Guards (John Doe)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melee Thao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mergendahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?