Belfor USA Group, Inc. v. Chicago's Best, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Defendant: Chicago's Best, LLC, Randall Grimes, Judy Grimes and Dupaco Community Credit Union, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00614
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part 161 Defendant's Motion in Limine; denying (except to the extent offered or argued to show Belfor's deep pockets) 163 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 165 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; denying 167 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting 172 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/9/15. (jat)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying Belfor's motions for summary judgment 33 , 66 , 127 , 131 and 153 ; granting in part and denying in part Dupaco's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting Belfor's Motion to Strike 116 . Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 01/16/2015. (mfh)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Entry of Default as to defendant Chicago's Best, LLC. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/25/14. (krj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belfor USA Group, Inc. v. Chicago's Best, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alan G. B. Kim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago's Best, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupaco Community Credit Union, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?