Ajala, Mustafa-El v. Swiekatowski, William et al

Plaintiff: Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala
Defendant: William Swiekatowski, Gary Boughton, Patrick Brandt, Michael Delvaux and William Pollard
Case Number: 3:2013cv00638
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 169 Motion for Transcripts to Be Produced Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §753(f). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/13/2016. (jef),(ps)
April 1, 2016 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on appeal ifp request: Initial partial appeal filing fee of $38.78 due 4/20/2016. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/2016. (jef),(ps)
February 5, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 154 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/5/2016. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant William Swiekatowski dismissing the case. (BBC /PAO). (jef),(ps)
August 19, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 120 motions in limine; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 105 and 134 motions in limine. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/19/2015. (jef),(ps)
August 14, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 motion to appear at trial in street clothes. Any clothes plaintiff wishes to wear must be brought to the courthouse not later than 2 p.m. on Friday, August 21, 2015. Alternatively, plaintiff could ask prison officials to transfer his clothing to the marshal when they bring him to the courthouse for trial. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/14/2015. (jef),(ps)
July 30, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff may have until August 12, 2015 to file and serve the notice described in this order. If plaintiff does not comply with that deadline, I will construe plaintiff's silence to mean that he no longer wishes to use the interviews at trial. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/2015. (jef),(ps)
July 24, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Titus Henderson's 96 Motion because he is not a party to the case and he does not have the right to intervene. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/24/2015. (elc),(ps)
June 15, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/15/2015. (jef),(ps)
April 10, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that:1. The motion for summary judgment filed by defendants William Swiekatowski, Gary Boughton, Patrick Brandt, Michael Delvaux and William Pollard, dkt. 33 , is DENIED as to the claim of plaintiff Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala (formerly known as Dennis Jones-El) that defendant Swiektowski issued a conduct report against plaintiff because of his race and religion. 2. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in all other respects. 3. Because of a conflict in the court' ;s schedule, the trial in this case is RESCHEDULED for August 24, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. with a final pretrial conference at 8:30 a.m. the same morning. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and all motions in limine are due July 23, 2015 and objections are due August 7, 2015. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/10/2015. (nln),(ps)
February 10, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel, denying plaintiff's 53 motion for assistance in recruiting counsel. Plaintiff may have until March 6, 2015, to file his opposition to defendants'motion for summary judgmen t. Defendants may have until March 16, 2015, to file a reply. Because plaintiff's new deadline is nearly two months after his original deadline, he should not expect to receive any additional extensions of time in the absence of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/10/2015. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 51 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have until January 23, 2015 to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel. Plaintiff may have until January 30, 2015, to file a reply. Br iefing on defendants' motion for summary judgment is STAYED pending resolution of plaintiff's motion to compel. Because the motion to compel is stalling the summary judgment motion, the parties should not expect to receive any extensions of time with respect to the motion to compel in the absence of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/16/2015. (jef),(ps)
December 31, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants 32 Motion to to file pages 175-90 of exhibit 102 in camera. Defendants may have until January 8, 2015 to serve plaintiff Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala (formerly known as Dennis Jones-El) with pages 96-174 of exhibit 102 or to show cause why they should not be required to do so. If defendants do not serve the documents, plaintiff may have until January 20, 2015, to file a response. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/31/2014. (elc),(ps)
June 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/27/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 motion to apply recent filing fees to this case. The remainder of the initial partial filing fee, which is $8.04, is due 12/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/9/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 16, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dated 7/31/2013, dkt. 21, from case 13-cv-102-bbc. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajala, Mustafa-El v. Swiekatowski, William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Swiekatowski
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Delvaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?