Sanders, Paschall v. Rhodes, Kitty et al
Plaintiff: Paschall L. Sanders
Defendant: Dennis Smith, Kitty Rhodes and Otis Woods
Case Number: 3:2013cv00649
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that, within twenty (20) days, plaintiff Pasqual J. Sanders shall either ( l) pay the $505.00 appellate docketing fee; or (2) submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, together with a certified copy of his resident account statement, in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(2). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/26/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff Paschall L. Sander's request for leave to proceed and dismissing this case for lack of jursdiction. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying the request for leave to proceed by plaintiff Paschall L. Sanders III. This case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as MOOT. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/24/2014. (jef),(ps)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting plaintiff's 5 motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Initial partial filing fee of $ 32.00 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 11/1/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 10/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/24/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders, Paschall v. Rhodes, Kitty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Rhodes
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paschall L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?