Simpson, Willie v. Walker, Scott et al

Plaintiff: Willie Simpson
Defendant: Scott Walker, J.B. Van Hollen, Edward F. Walls, Timothy Haines, Sara Mason, Flannery, Dane Esser, Shawn Gallinger, Godfrey, Travis Parr, Primmer, 3 Unidentified John Doe Guards and Cathy A. Jess
Case Number: 3:2013cv00776
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 204 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/12/2016. (jef),(ps)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER regarding post-trial motions. Plaintiff's brief in support to his orally submitted motion for judgment as a matter of law due 28 days from entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/29/2016. (jef),(ps)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying 161 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/6/2016. (jef),(ps)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying plaintiff's 81 motion for preliminary injunctive relief, granting in part and denying in part defendants' 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot plaintiff's 138 , 142 Motions for Extension of Time; granti ng defendants' 153 Motion to Stay. Defendants Sara Mason, Captain Flannery, Ronald Torgerson, Ellen Ray, and William Brown are DISMISSED from the lawsuit. The schedule is amended as follows: Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures, motions in limine, propos ed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, and proposed verdict forms due November 16, 2015. Objections due December 2, 2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for December 14, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Trial set for December 14, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/9/2015. (jef),(ps)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that plaintiff Willie Simpson may have until June 20, 2014 to submit supplemental briefing on his "motion to seal medical records," dkt. 33 . Defendants may have until June 27, 2014 to file their response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/6/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying plaintiff's 25 motion for extension of time; denying plaintiff's 26 motion to take early discovery. Plaintiff Willie Simpson's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, dkt. # 1 , is DENIED without prejudice to plaintiff's refiling his motion at a later date. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/14/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that an initial partial filing fee of $0.08 assessed for each of the cases plaintiff wishes to pursue. (Designation of cases plaintiff is proceeding with and the initial partial filing fee(s) are due 2/10/2014.) Plaintiff's motion to take early discovery, dkt. # 8 , is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/27/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that plaintiff Willie Simpson must respond to this order by December 27, 2013. If plaintiff fails to respond to the order, I will dismiss the case for his failure to prosecute it. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/9/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson, Willie v. Walker, Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Van Hollen
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Walls
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Haines
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Mason
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flannery
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Esser
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gallinger
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godfrey
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Parr
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primmer
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Unidentified John Doe Guards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy A. Jess
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?