Bohanan, James v. Eckstein, Scott
Petitioner: James P. Bohanan
Respondent: Michael Baenen
Case Number: 3:2013cv00808
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay. The clerk's office is directed to administratively close this case. To reopen this case, Bohanan must advise the court and the respondent by filing a written motion to reinstate within thirty days of the completion of proceedings in the Wisconsin state courts. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/10/2014. (jef),(ps)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part petitioner's motion (dkt. 20 ). Petitioner's brief in support of his petition will be due no later than November 3, 2014. Respondent's brief in opposition will be due thirty days after Bohanan's brief is filed. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/8/2014. (elc),(ps)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit $5 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and trust fund account statement. $5 filing fee or Motion and Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/12/2013. Petitioner's 1 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/20/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohanan, James v. Eckstein, Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James P. Bohanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Baenen
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?