U.S. Water Services, Inc. v. Novozymes A/S et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Water Services, Inc.
Defendant: Novozymes A/S and Novozymes North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00864
Filed: December 17, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2015 565 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 564 Motion to Stay Post-Judgment Proceedings. Any motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) for taxation of costs or for an award of attorney fees must be filed by: (1) 14 days after the deadline to file a notice of a ppeal, if neither party appeals the judgment; (2) if either party appeals the judgment, 30 days after the issuance of a mandate from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, if defendants are still prevailing parties; or (3) by a date set by further order of this court if neither (1) nor (2) applies. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/13/2015. (jls)
July 29, 2015 561 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 273 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment that claims 1, 6, 12 a nd 13 of the '137 patent, and claims 1, 2, 5-12, 16-22, 25, 28-32, 34 and 35 of the '399 patent are invalid is GRANTED. Defendants' motion is DENIED as moot in all other respects. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on the issue of inequitable conduct is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED as moot in all other respects. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/29/2015. (jls) Modified on 7/29/2015. (arw)
June 11, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Transfer to District of Minnesota; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss amended complaint; denying as moot 57 Motion to Stay discovery; granting 71 Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/11/14. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Water Services, Inc. v. Novozymes A/S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Water Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lissa R. Koop
Represented By: Anne M. Readel
Represented By: Colin Gene Sandercock
Represented By: John S. Skilton
Represented By: Michelle Marie Umberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novozymes A/S
Represented By: Allen A. Arntsen
Represented By: Brian D. Buckley
Represented By: Ewa Davison
Represented By: Virginia DeMarchi
Represented By: Michael Craig Saunders, II
Represented By: David K. Tellekson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novozymes North America, Inc.
Represented By: Allen A. Arntsen
Represented By: Brian D. Buckley
Represented By: Ewa Davison
Represented By: Virginia DeMarchi
Represented By: Michael Craig Saunders, II
Represented By: David K. Tellekson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?