Rigsby, Rodney v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Rigsby
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Chris Miscik, Bruce Berndt, Berndt, CPA, Michael Riley, Axley Brnelson, LLP, Kristine Burck, Marilyn Wetley, Levine Wetley and Unity Health Plans Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv00023
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER that plaintiff Catherine Conrad's request for unspecified relief, Dkt. 233 , is DENIED. The court will disregard any future documents that Conrad files with the court until she shows that she has satisfied the sanctions issued against her in Rigsby v. Miscik, No. 14-CV-23-BBC, 2015 WL 1893569 (W.D. Wis. Apr. 24, 2015). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/7/2019. (rks),(ps)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Axley Brnelson, LLP, Chris Miscik, Michael Riley against Catherine Conrad, Quincy M. Neri, Rodney Rigsby; in favor of Axley Brnelson, LLP, Chris Miscik, Michael Riley against Rodney Rigsby in the amount of $ 11,025.00. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying 187 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/14/2015. (jef),(ps)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING 104 , 106 Motions to Intervene filed by Catherine Conrad and Quincy Neri. The 112 , 115 , 117 , 123 , 125 135 motions filed by defendants Bruce Berndt, Berndt, CPA, Axley Brynelson LLP, Chris Miscik, Michael Riley and Unity Health Plans Insurance Corporation, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Kristine Burck, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Levine Wetley and Marilyn Wetley to dismiss or strike plaintiff's "amended complaint" and "corre cted amended complaint" are GRANTED. Plaintiff's original complaint remains the operative pleading. Plaintiff's 126 , 131 motions to compel discovery are DENIED. The 128 motion to compel discovery filed by defendants Miscik, Riley and Axley Brynelson is DENIED as moot, but their 128 motion for attorney fees is GRANTED. Defendants Miscik, Riley and Axley Brynelson may have until to September 26, 2014, to submit an itemized request for the reasonable expenses they incurred in bringing their motion to compel. Plaintiff may have until October 3, 2014, to file any objections. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/18/2014. (nln),(ps)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 79 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 80 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 76 Motion for Attorney Fees; and denying 93 motion to stay discovery. America n Family Mutual Insurance Company, Kristine Burck, Marilyn Wetley and Levine Wetley awarded attorney fees in the amount of $3328.42. Chris Miscik and Axley Brynelson awarded attorney fees in the amount of $9337.50. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company awarded attorney fees in the amount of $10,444.60. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/8/2014. (jef),(ps)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 33 Motion for Sanctions; granting 39 Motion for Sanctions; denying 65 Motion for Sanctions; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; grant ing 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The motion for sanctions filed by defendants Miscik, Riley and Axley Brynelson, dkt. # 51 , is GRANTED IN PART. I will award attorney fees to these defendants with respect to plaintiff's claims for breach of fiduciary duty, fraud and conversion. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Defendants Miscik, Riley, Axley Brynelson, Progressive, American Family, Kristine Burck, Levine Wetley and Marilyn Wetley may have until May 2, 2014, to submit an itemized request for attorney fees. Plaintiff may have until May 16, 2014, to file a response. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/17/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby, Rodney v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine C. Tushaus Steffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Miscik
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Berndt
Represented By: Patrick Jon Lubenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berndt, CPA
Represented By: Patrick Jon Lubenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Riley
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axley Brnelson, LLP
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Burck
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Wetley
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levine Wetley
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unity Health Plans Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jon G. Furlow
Represented By: Christopher Edward Nyenhuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?