Haley, Mary et al v. Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Haley, Michael Haley, Leslie Banks, James Banks, Annie Buinewicz, Brian Buinewicz, Gary Samuels and Matthew Deller
Defendant: Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00099
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. declaring that intervenor defendants United States Fire Insurance Company and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company have a duty to defend defendant Kolbe in this case. (BBC/PAO) (kwf)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER vacating 568 Judgment entered in favor of intervenor defendants United States Fire Insurance Company and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Defendant Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. and the intervenor defendants shall have until October 20, 2017 to file any motions related to attorney fees and costs in this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/18/2017. (kwf)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 OPINION and ORDER granting 531 United States Fire Insurance Company's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment; granting summary judgment to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company on the Court's own motion, denying as moot 552 United States Fire's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority; denying United States Fire's motion for leave to amend its complaint. It is DECLARED that neither United States Fire nor Fireman's Fund has a duty to defend defendant Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. in this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/25/16. (jat)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting 546 , 553 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/8/2016. (kwf)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 OPINION and ORDER denying 525 Motion for Reconsideration of the March 25, 2016 Order. The remaining individual claims brought by plaintiffs are DISMISSED. The clerk of court is directed to close this case and enter judgment in favor of defendant K olbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. Intervenor United States Fire Insurance Company may have until June 17, 2016, to show cause why I should not deny its motion for summary judgment as moot. Defendant may have until June 24, 2016, to file a response. United States Fire may have until June 29, 2016, to file a reply. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/7/2016. (kwf)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER reinstating and granting 317 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses; denying 388 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 496 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23. Plaintiffs shall have until 4/8/2016 to show cause why the claims of the named plaintiffs should not be dismissed for the same reasons that the court is denying the motion for class certification. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/25/2016. (arw)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 OPINION and ORDER denying 443 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; granting 450 Motion to Strike the Declaration of Joel M. Wolf. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/1/2016. (kwf)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 OPINION and ORDER denying 284 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23. Plaintiffs may have until January 15, 2016, to file a renewed motion for class certification with respect to the limited issues concerning liability and equitable relief identifie d in this order. Defendant may have until January 29, 2016 to file a response, and plaintiffs may have until February 8, 2016 to reply. If plaintiffs do not respond by January 15, 2016, the case will proceed on the individual claims of the named plai ntiffs only. The February 1, 2016 trial date is stricken. The court will set a telephonic conference to revise the schedule in this case after the issue of class certification is resolved. The motions in limine filed by the parties, 317 , 375 , 380 , 388 , 394 , 400 , 402 , 410 , 411 , 412 , 415 , 419 , 420 , 422 and 429 , are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/18/2015. (kwf)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 OPINION and ORDER denying 367 Motion for Reconsideration re: 233 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/6/2015. (kwf)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 OPINION and ORDER granting intervenor United States Fire's 294 Motion for Summary Judgment on defendant Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co.'s claims that United States Fire breached its duty to defend defendant and acted in bad faith; denying 261 and 265 Motions for Summary Judgment filed by intervenors United States Fire and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company regarding their duty to defend and indemnify defendant. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/2/2015. (kwf)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting defendant's 207 motion to compel discovery responses from the intervening insurance companies; granting defendant's 220 motion for leave to file a reply brief; granting defendant's 226 motion to compel damage disclosures by plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/18/2015. (kwf)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to amend the caption to change the name of plaintiff Patricia Samuels to Patricia Groome; granting plaintiff's 214 motion for leave to file a surreply brief; granting in part and denying in part defendant Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co.'s 164 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/15/2015. (kwf)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying 109 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; granting 114 Motion to Join; denying 115 Motion to Dismiss; granting 124 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/1/2015. (kwf)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Sanctions by defendant Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co, Inc.; granting 73 Motion to Intervene by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; granting 84 , 100 Motions to join by United States Fire Insurance Company; and denying 73 motion to bifurcate and stay proceedings. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/10/2014. (nln) Modified docket text on 12/10/2014 (nln).
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss with respect to the Home Improvement Practices Act claimed alleged in counts VII through IX of the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/6/14. (rep)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/24/14. (rep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley, Mary et al v. Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Haley
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Haley
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Banks
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Banks
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Buinewicz
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Buinewicz
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Samuels
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Deller
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: James A. Olson
Represented By: Bonnie J. Prober
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolbe and Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gordon Davenport, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Lee
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?