Godwin, Roger v. RN Kathy et al
Plaintiff: Roger Dale Godwin
Defendant: RN Helen, A. Fatoki, RN Bonnie and RN Kathy
Case Number: 3:2014cv00368
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Sauk
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO/elc). (elc),(ps)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Roger Dale Godwin is directed to show cause, if any, by responding in writing within twenty (20) days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. No further action will be taken in this case unt il Godwin files a response. Godwin is advised that, if he does not respond to this order as directed, then this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution without further notice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (b). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/3/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godwin, Roger v. RN Kathy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Helen
Represented By: W. Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Fatoki
Represented By: W. Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Bonnie
Represented By: W. Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Kathy
Represented By: W. Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Dale Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?