BENNETT, GREGORY D. v. USA
Petitioner: Gregory D. Bennett
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv00392
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability and granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/17/2014. (voc)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration re 8 Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255 and for appointment of counsel filed by Gregory D. Bennett Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/10/2014. (voc)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered denying 2255 motion. (BBC /VO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/4/2014. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENNETT, GREGORY D. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory D. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?