Ryan v. USA
Petitioner: Trevor K. Ryan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv00430
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Iowa
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Petitioner's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal and denying his motion for appointment of counsel for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/14. (rep)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/19/14. (rep)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting briefing on 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255. Brief in Opposition due 7/8/2014. Brief in Reply due 7/31/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/16/14. (rep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Shea
Represented By: Elizabeth Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trevor K. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?