Tonn, Dennis v. Dittmann, Michael et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Tonn
Defendant: Michael A. Dittmann, Michael Meisner, Edward F. Wall, Sandy Hautamaki, David Melby, Donald Morgan, Mary Leiser, Janel Nickel and Wis. Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2014cv00481
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 59 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/7/2016. (jef),(ps)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, dismissing this case without prejudice; and denying as moot 42 Motion to Amend Complaint. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/7/2015. (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that plaintiff Dennis Tonn may have until October 23, 2015, to file a supplemental brief in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment.Defendants' reply, if any, will be due by October 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/2015. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration; denying without prejudice 29 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/26/2015. (jef),(ps)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/6/2015. (jef),(ps)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (PAO/nln). (nln),(ps)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 242.13 assessed. (Initial partial filing fee due 7/24/2014.) Plaintiff's 4 motion for use of release account funds to pay the filing fee is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/3/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonn, Dennis v. Dittmann, Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Dittmann
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Hautamaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Melby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Leiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janel Nickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wis. Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?