Golf Solutions I, LLC v. Prestige Flag Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Golf Solutions I, LLC
Defendant: Prestige Flag Manufacturing Company, Inc. and Michael L. Roberts
Case Number: 3:2014cv00869
Filed: December 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 87 Motion to Stay and Transfer this case to California. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/22/2015. (kwf)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying defendant Prestige Flag Manufacturing Company, Inc's motion to strike plaintiff Golf Solutions I, LLC's reply brief. The parties will negotiate terms of an appropriate escrow to hold payments due under the Promissory Note. The parties may submit briefs on the subject of the enforceability of the no-offset clause in the promissory note by February 9, 2015. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/3/2015. (kwf)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Transfer Venue; denying 27 Emergency Motion to Stay; setting briefing on 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Brief in Opposition due 1/26/2015. The hearing on the motion remains on the calendar for 2/3/2015. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/16/2015. (arw)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that plaintiff Golf Solutions I, LLC, may have until January 13, 2015, to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship for purposes of determining subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Defendants must file their response to the motion for preliminary injunction by January 20, 2015. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/30/2014. (nln)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golf Solutions I, LLC v. Prestige Flag Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golf Solutions I, LLC
Represented By: Marcia F. O'Loughlin
Represented By: Melissa O'Loughlin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Flag Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Randall Bader
Represented By: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Roberts
Represented By: Martin Randall Bader
Represented By: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?