Coleman, Robert v. U.S. Trustee's Office et al
Appellant: Robert Coleman
Appellee: U.S. Trustee's Office, Spenta Enterprises, Inc. and Hoshang R. Karani
Case Number: 3:2014cv00879
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The bankruptcy appeal is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/26/2015. (kwf)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Colemans have 14 days to notify the court whether they intend to pursue these appeals. If the court does not receive a response from both Robert Coleman and Chizuco Coleman within the deadline, these appeals will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/11/2015. (kwf)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Amended Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Needler may have until March 2, 2015, to provide the court with an update on the status of his representation in this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/20/2015. (kwf)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that plaintiffs-appellants Robert Coleman and Chizuco Coleman's Emergency Motions to Stay, (dkt. 3 in case number 14-cv-879 and dkt. 3 in case number 14-cv-880) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/29/2014. (nln)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman, Robert v. U.S. Trustee's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Coleman
Represented By: Willliam Lowell Needler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Represented By: Debra L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Spenta Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Cohen
Represented By: Elmer Philip Groben, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hoshang R. Karani
Represented By: Joseph E. Cohen
Represented By: Elmer Philip Groben, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?