Lancour, Shane v. City of LaCrosse PD et al
Plaintiff: Shane T. Lancour
Defendant: City of LaCrosse PD, LaCrosse Police Department, Heath Parshall, Jason Nesbit and Tony DeLap
Case Number: 3:2015cv00105
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that the clerk's office enter Katelynn Williams and William Parsonsof the law firm of Hawks Quindel as plaintiff's pro bono counsel of record and to set this case for a status conference in July 2017, as the court's schedule allows. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/29/2017. (jef),(ps)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 40 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. The proceedings in this case are STAYED pending recruitment of counsel for plaintiff. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/18/2017. (jef),(ps)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Amending first paragraph on page 3 of 12 Order on Leave to Proceed. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/21/2015. (elc),(ps)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing plaintiff Shane T. Lancour's complaint, without prejudice, for want of prosecution. (PAO/nln). (nln),(ps)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/4/2015. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancour, Shane v. City of LaCrosse PD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane T. Lancour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of LaCrosse PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaCrosse Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Nesbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony DeLap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?