Doe No. 55, Jane v. Madison Metropolitan School District
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 55
Defendant: Madison Metropolitan School District
Case Number: 3:2015cv00570
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Motion to Exclude Docket Nos. 77, 78 and 79 from the record on appeal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/25/2017. (arw)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION and ORDER denying 95 Motion for Oral Argument; denying 96 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/9/2017. (kwf)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION and ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 50 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 87 Motion for Leave to File Additional Expert Report. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/16/2016. (kwf)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Reconsideration re: 23 Motion for Protective Order filed by John Doe 75. John Doe's motion for a protective order is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/27/2016. (kwf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe No. 55, Jane v. Madison Metropolitan School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 55
Represented By: Arick W Fudali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Metropolitan School District
Represented By: Peggy Ellen Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?