Glenn, Gwendolyn v. US Bank

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn D. Glenn
Defendant: US Bank
Case Number: 3:2015cv00816
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/6/2016. (jef),(ps)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that plaintiff is to submit $400 filing fee or a motion for ifp and financial affidavit. Fee or motion and affidavit due 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/28/2015. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn, Gwendolyn v. US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn D. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?