Gaylor, Annie et al v. Lew, Jacob et al

Plaintiff: Annie Laurie Gaylor, Dan Barker, Ian Gaylor and Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Jacob Lew, John Koskinen and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv00215
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION AND ORDER. It is DECLARED that 26 U.S.C. § 107(2) violates the establishment clause of the First Amendment to the United States Constitution. Defendants Steve Mnuchin, John Koskinen and the United States of America are ENJOINED from enfo rcing 26 U.S.C. § 107(2). The injunction shall take effect 180 days after the conclusion of any appeals filed by defendants or intervenor defendants or the expiration of defendants' or intervenor-defendants' deadline for filing an appe al, whichever is later. The request for a tax refund made by plaintiff Freedom from Religion Foundation, Annie Laurie Gaylor, Dan Barker and Ian Gaylor, as the personal representative of the estate of Anne Nicol Gaylor, is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/13/2017. (arw)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CORRECTED ORDER re 86 OPINION AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/6/17. (jat)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION & ORDER granting 21 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/19/17. (jat)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. The complaint is DISMISSED as to the claim that 26 U.S.C. § 107(1) is unconstitutional. The case will proceed on the claim that 26 U.S.C. § 107(2) is unconstitutional. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/24/16. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaylor, Annie et al v. Lew, Jacob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Laurie Gaylor
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Barker
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Gaylor
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje(Designation Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?