Humphrey, Ian v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ian Humphrey
Defendant: Transunion LLC, Navient Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00370
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff Ian Humphrey against Navient Solutions, Inc. awarding compensatory damages in the amount of $180,000.00 in accordance with the jury's verdict on Humphrey's claim under 15 U.S.C. § 1 681s-2 that Navient failed to reasonably investigate disputes that Humphrey's accounts under the Federal Family Education Loan Program were inaccurately identified as past due in December 2012 and from July 2013 to December 2013. In all other respects, judgment is entered in favor of Navient. (JDP/PAO) (kwf)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OPINION and ORDER granting 195 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the issue of willfulness; denying as moot as to punitive damages and denying as unripe as to compensatory damages 210 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/8/2020. (kwf)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER directing the clerk of court set a telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen Crocker to set a trial date and related deadlines. Plaintiff Ian Humphrey's "motion to dismiss" Equifax Information Services, Experian Information Services, and Transunion, Dkt. 169 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/5/2019. (jef),(ps)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Navient Solutions, Inc. dismissing the case. (kwf)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION & ORDER granting 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 43 Motion to Join; denying 44 Motion for Hearing; granting 50 Motion to Join; denying 51 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 52 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 62 Amended Motion for Leave to File; granting 67 Motion to Join. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/17/2017. (kwf)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Ian Humphrey's 2 petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 6/03/2016. (nln),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey, Ian v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?