Springs Window Fashions, LLC v. Hunter Douglas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Springs Window Fashions, LLC
Defendant: Hunter Douglas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00449
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf)
April 18, 2017 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal of all Claims and Counterclaims. (Scheller, John)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulated motion for protective order #23 is granted and the parties' proposed order is accepted and entered as the court's own order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/19/2017. (kwf)
January 18, 2017 Filing 23 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (Scheller, John)
November 23, 2016 Filing 22 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Scheller, John)
November 11, 2016 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Kenneth M. Albridge for Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Albridge, Kenneth)
November 10, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Springs Window Fashions, LLC by Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph) (Lesser, Jacqueline) Modified on 11/13/2016. (lak)
October 27, 2016 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Hunter Douglas, Inc., filed by Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Office Action Response (8-5-2016) (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A - Office Action Response (8-5-2016) (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B - Office Action Response (7-26-1993), #4 Exhibit C - Interview Summary (8-17-2005), #5 Exhibit D - Office Action Response (8-23-2005), #6 Exhibit E - Letter to 6-17-16 Springs Window Fashions from Hunter Douglas, Inc.) (Scheller, John) Modified on 10/28/2016. (lak)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 10/27/2016. Dispositive Motions due 6/2/2017. Settlement Letters due 9/29/2017. Motions in Limine due 10/6/2017, Responses due 10/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 3:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/13/2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/2016. (kwf)
September 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/27/2016 [:08] (cak)
September 21, 2016 Filing 17 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Counter Defendant Springs Window Fashions, LLC, Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Scheller, John)
September 13, 2016 Filing 16 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Springs Window Fashions, LLC, Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Office Action Response (8-5-2016) (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A - Office Action Response (8-5-2016) (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B - Office Action Response (7-26-1993)/Patent and Trademark Office Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Interview Summary (8-17-2005)) (Scheller, John) Modified on 9/14/2016. (lak)
August 24, 2016 Action Requested: Please submit Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment. #Consent/Request for Reassignment forms due 9/13/2016. (kwf)
August 24, 2016 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2016 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
August 23, 2016 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Hunter Douglas, Inc., Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Lesser, Jacqueline)
August 23, 2016 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Springs Window Fashions, LLC by Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo) (Lesser, Jacqueline) Modified on 8/24/2016. (lak)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Jacqueline M. Lesser Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/23. (lak)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Charlie C. Lyu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/23/2016. (lak)
August 22, 2016 Filing 11 Motion to Admit Jacqueline M. Lesser Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1869236.) by Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Lesser, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2016 Filing 10 Motion to Admit Charlie C. Lyu Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1869233.) by Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Lyu, Charlie)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Nancy A. Rubner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/22/2016. (lak)
August 22, 2016 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Nancy A. Rubner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1869088.) by Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Rubner, Nancy)
August 15, 2016 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Modl for Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Modl, Michael)
August 15, 2016 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew J. Clarkowski for Defendant Hunter Douglas, Inc. (Clarkowski, Andrew)
August 10, 2016 Filing 5 Notice by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC of Answer Date. (Scheller, John)
August 10, 2016 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Hunter Douglas, Inc. served on 7/18/2016, answer due 8/8/2016. (Scheller, John)
August 9, 2016 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
June 24, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hunter Douglas, Inc. (kwf)
June 24, 2016 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Civil Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
June 24, 2016 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
June 23, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Scheller, John)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Hunter Douglas, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1833236.), filed by Springs Window Fashions, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6-17-16 Letter to Springs Window Fashions from Hunter Douglas, Inc., #2 Summons - Hunter Douglas, Inc., #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Scheller, John) Modified on 6/23/2016. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springs Window Fashions, LLC v. Hunter Douglas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Douglas, Inc.
Represented By: Charlie C. Lyu
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Represented By: Andrew J. Clarkowski
Represented By: Nancy A. Rubner
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springs Window Fashions, LLC
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Kenneth M. Albridge
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Joseph D. Brydges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?