Teas, William v. Suliene, Dalia et al
Plaintiff: William Teas
Defendant: Dalia Suliene, Karl Hoffman, Karen Anderson, Meredith Mashak, Lillian Tenebruso, Nancy White, Anthony Ashworth, Michael Weber, David Melby, Janel Nickel, Kevin Boodry, Michael Dittmann, James Greer, Edward Wall and Bowar
Case Number: 3:2016cv00452
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (rks),(ps)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that plaintiff William Teas's motion for assistance in recruiting counsel and for injunctive relief, dkt. # 72 , and motion to stay, dkt. # 94 , are DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to compel and for sanctions, dkt. # 88 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Suliene must provide a corrected response to plaintiff's interrogatory number 57 by June 7, 2019. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is DENIED. The clerk of court is directed to send to plaintiff a copy of this court's procedures for requesting preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/29/2019. (jef/skv w/ enclosures),(ps)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that the clerk of court should set a telephone scheduling conference with Magistrate Judge Crocker to set a new schedule for this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/10/2018. (jef),(ps)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the stay in this case is LIFTED. Plaintiff William Teas may have until October 1, 2018, to inform the court in writing whether he wishes to: (1) continue litigating the case but without counsel; or (2) dismiss the case without prej udice. If plaintiff chooses the first option, the clerk of court will set a telephone scheduling conference with Magistrate Judge Crocker. If plaintiff fails to respond by October 1, I will construe his silence to mean that he is choosing the second option and I will direct the clerk of court to close the case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/17/2018. (jef),(ps)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/7/2017. (jef),(ps)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying plaintiff William Teas's motion to expedite recruitment of counsel and for preliminary injunction, dkt. # 57 , with respect to his request to expedite recruitment of counsel. With respect to his motion for preliminary injuncti ve relief, defendants may have until November 6, 2017 to file a response that includes evidence regarding plaintiff's (1) medical restrictions, (2) current bunk assignment and (3) available alternatives, if any. Plaintiff may have until November 13, 2017 to file a reply. The stay on discovery is lifted solely for the purpose of addressing plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/30/2017. (jef),(ps)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 41.86 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/24/2016. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teas, William v. Suliene, Dalia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Teas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalia Suliene
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Mashak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Tenebruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Melby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janel Nickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Boodry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?