Roberts, Terrance v. Williams, Louis

Petitioner: Terrance Roberts
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Case Number: 3:2016cv00541
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 24 JUDGMENT entered dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 12/12/2017. (jef),(ps)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER that respondent Tom Watson may have until July 31, 2017, to file a second supplemental response to the order to show cause. Petitioner may have until August 10, 2017, to respond. The parties should not expect to receive any extensions of time in the absence of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/11/2017. (jef),(ps)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER that a decision on petitioner Terrance Roberts's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is STAYED. Respondent Louis Williams II may have until May 16, 2017, to file an amended response that addresses the issues discussed in this order. Petitioner may have until May 30, 2017, to file a reply. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/24/2017. (jef),(ps)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER that petitioner Terrance Roberts pay $5 fee or submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/2/2016. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts, Terrance v. Williams, Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?