Liebhart, William et al v. SPX Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William Liebhart, Nancy Liebhart, Jacob Liebhart and Emily Liebhart
Defendant: SPX Corporation, TRC Companies, Inc. and Apollo Dismanteling Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00700
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER directing clerk of court to forward this order to the Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit so that the case may be remanded pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12.1 and Circuit Rule 57. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/22/2020. (kwf)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants SPX Corporation, TRC Environmental Corporation, and Apollo Dismantling Services, Inc. against plaintiffs William Leibhart and Nancy Liebhart dismissing the case. (kwf)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 OPINION and ORDER denying 239 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 236 Request for Deadlines Based on New Evidence of Widespread Dangerous PCB Levels, 243 Motion to Limit the Issues Addressed on Remand and to Sch edule Briefing. The parties may have until June 3, 2019, to file opening briefs addressing the question whether defendants are entitled to summary judgment under the standard articulated by the court of appeals. The parties may have until June 27, 2019, to file response briefs. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/20/2019. (kwf)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 OPINION & ORDER granting 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and otherwise denying as moot 80 , 81 , 90 , 91 , 105 , 106 Motions in Limine to Exclude the Opinions of David Carpenter and John Woodyard; denying 164 Motion for Leave to Supplement Carpenter's Expert Report; denying 176 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denying as moot 188 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 192 , 197 , 198 Motions in Limine to Exclude Opinion of Jonathan Libber. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/30/2018. (kwf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebhart, William et al v. SPX Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Liebhart
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Represented By: Carey S. Rosemarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Liebhart
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Represented By: Carey S. Rosemarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Liebhart
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Represented By: Carey S. Rosemarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Liebhart
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Represented By: Carey S. Rosemarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Dismanteling Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?