Minerva Dairy, Inc. et al v. Brancel, Ben et al
Plaintiff: Minerva Dairy, Inc. and Adam Mueller
Defendant: Ben Brancel, Brad Schimel and Peter J. Haase
Case Number: 3:2017cv00299
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Ben Brancel, Peter J. Haase, Brad Schimel dismissing the case. (voc)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION & ORDER denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/18/2017. (kwf)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting briefing on 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Minerva Dairy, Inc. and Adam Mueller. Brief in Reply due 7/24/2017. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/10/2017. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minerva Dairy, Inc. et al v. Brancel, Ben et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Dairy, Inc.
Represented By: Anastasia Paulinna Boden
Represented By: Wencong Fa
Represented By: Joshua Paul Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Mueller
Represented By: Anastasia Paulinna Boden
Represented By: Wencong Fa
Represented By: Joshua Paul Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Brancel
Represented By: Katherine D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Schimel
Represented By: Katherine D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Haase
Represented By: Katherine D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?