Carr, Melinda et al v. Department of Public Instruction et al

Plaintiff: Melinda J. Carr, Alistair P. Carr and Student: S.C.
Defendant: Department of Public Instruction and New Glarus School District
Case Number: 3:2017cv00413
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 10/12/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Defendant Department of Public Instruction's 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendant New Glarus School District's 27 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have until March 5, 2018, to serve the New Glarus School District with th e complaint and summons in this lawsuit consistent with requirement of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Once service is complete, plaintiffs shall file proof promptly with the court. Failure to do so timely will result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/22/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that plaintiffs Melinda J. Carr and Alistair P. Carr's motion to supplement the administrative record (dkt. # 43 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of expert disclosure deadline (dkt. # 57 ) and motion to strike (dkt. # 48 ) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/9/2018. (jef),(ps)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 11 , 12 Motions for Entry of Default as to defendant New Glarus School District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/9/2017. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr, Melinda et al v. Department of Public Instruction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alistair P. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student: S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Instruction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Glarus School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?