Chazen, Todd v. Williams, Louis

Petitioner: Todd Richard Chazen
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Case Number: 3:2017cv00447
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marquette
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. (JDP /PAO) (elc),(ps)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying Todd Richard Chazen's 18 Motion for Entry of Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of this order to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that petitioner Todd Richard Chazen's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota for the purpose of resentencing without regard to 18 U.S.C. § 924(e). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/25/2018. (jef),(ps)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the court will appoint counsel for petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of this order and a Criminal Justice Act form 23 to petitioner. Petitioner must complete and file the CJA form 23 within four weeks from the date of this order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/28/2017. (jef/cc: petitioner w/ CJA form 23),(ps)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen submit $5 fee or motion to proceed ifp along with Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/8/2017. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chazen, Todd v. Williams, Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd Richard Chazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?