Capone, Philip v. Meisner, Chip et al
Petitioner: Philip P. Capone, III
Respondent: Chip Meisner and State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2017cv00781
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Sauk
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting petitioner Philip P. Capone, III's 16 motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal. Petitioner must pay the $505 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal by April 9, 2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/5/2018. (jef),(ps)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT entered denying Philip P. Capone, III's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 and dismissing this case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/16/2017. (jef),(ps)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that petitioner Philip P. Capone, II submit $5 fee or Inmate Account Statement by 11/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/16/2017. (nln),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capone, Philip v. Meisner, Chip et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip P. Capone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chip Meisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Charlotte Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?