Collins, Dontae v. Mahoney, David et al

Plaintiff: Dontae Collins
Defendant: David Mahoney and Dane County Sherriff Office
Case Number: 3:2018cv00023
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/30/2018. (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Dontae Collins may have until August 20, 2018, to file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/6/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 5, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Martin James Engelhart may have until February 26, 2018, to submit (1) a single complaint signed by Engelhart and plaintiff Dontae Collins and (2) the $400 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment and a trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the date of the complaint. If Engelhart fails to do so, I will screen Collins's complaint alone. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/5/2018. (jef),(ps)
January 10, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 10.83 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/10/2018. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins, Dontae v. Mahoney, David et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontae Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County Sherriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?