Mlsna, Mark v. Union Pacific Railroad
Plaintiff: Mark Mlsna
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Case Number: 3:2018cv00037
Filed: January 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER denying 283 Motion for Judgment as to Plaintiff's Disparate Impact Claim; granting 289 Motion to Conform Jury Award of Compensatory and Punitive Damages to the Statutory Cap; granting in part and denying in part 293 Motion for Aw ard of Damages. Plaintiff's compensatory damage award is REDUCED to $300,000 and his punitive damage award is VACATED. Plaintiff is awarded $752,281.08 in back pay, $222,960.32 in prejudgment interest, and $391,228.62 in front pay, for a total of $1,366,470.02. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/3/2021. (arw)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER on disparate impact claim. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 07/01/2021. (mfh)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER : IT IS ORDERED that the parties' request for rulings on objections to certain designations is GRANTED, and the objections are sustained in part and overruled in part. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/25/2021. (voc)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER addressing final pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/18/2021. (nks)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part 186 Motions in Limine by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad, 193 Motions in Limine by Plaintiff Mark Mlsna. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/16/2021. (arw)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Strike ; denying 216 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 06/15/2021. (mfh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 141 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad. Plaintiff is to produce Mlsna's requested medical records by 4/19/2021. Plaintiff may file at any time a stand-alone motion in limine as to the admissibility of his application for disability benefits after learning of his not being recertified as a train conductor or medical records unrelated to his hearing deficit, except not later than 5/18/2021, and defendant may have 14 days to respond. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/30/2021. (arw)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 146 Motion to Quash; denying 157 Motion to Compel, except that not later than 3/18/2021, plaintiff must submit ex parte the unredacted email for the court to review. A decision on cost shifting is stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/11/2021. (arw)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OPINION AND ORDER denying 102 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/23/19. (jat)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting summary judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/15/2019. (DPM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/24/2019. (DPM)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing the Disclosure of Privileged Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/31/2018. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mlsna, Mark v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mlsna
Represented By: Nicholas Delton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?