McNeil, Marcia v. The Salvation Army et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Joanne McNeil
Defendant: The Salvation Army, Karlene Lenz and Robert Bonifield
Case Number: 3:2018cv00129
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0794
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT entered dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 6/19/2018. (jef),(ps)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel is denied. Amended complaint due 5/22/2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/1/2018. (jef),(ps)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended Complaint due 3/27/2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/6/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/26/2018. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil, Marcia v. The Salvation Army et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Joanne McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Salvation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlene Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bonifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?