Scolman, Joshua et al v. Walker, Scott et al
Plaintiff: Joshua J. Scolman, Kamau T.Z. Damali, Robert Jay Ward, Dennis Mix, Fredrick Andrew Morris, Scott A. Brown, Timothy Sidney and Jovan Williams
Defendant: Scott Walker, Jon Litscher, James Greer, David Burnett, M.D., Kevin Kallas, M.D., DAI Administrator, Wardens of CCI, WCI, GBCI and WSPF, Security Directors at CCI, WCI, WSPF, PSU Directors at CCI, WCI, GBCI, WSPF, HSU Managers at CCI, WCI, GBCI, WSPF and Unnamed John and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2018cv00496
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Plaintiff Kamau T.Z. Damali's 42 Motion for Reconsideration. Damali will be reinstated as a plaintiff in this case. The motions for extension of time filed by plaintiffs Fredrick Andrew Morris andJovan Williams, dkt. # 43 a nd # 45 , are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs may have until December 5, 2018 to file an amended complaint that complies with the October 18, 2018 order, dkt. # 41 . Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/8/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that plaintiffs Kamau T.Z. Damali, Robert Jay Ward, Dennis Mix, Scott A. Brown and Timothy Sidney are deemed to have withdrawn voluntarily from this case. Plaintiffs Fredrick Andrew Morris and Jovan Williams may have until November 14, 2 018 to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff Morris's motion for a preliminary injunction, dkt. # 32 , is DENIED. Kamau T.Z. Damali's motion to pay the filing fee, dkt. # 33 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/18/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that each plaintiff has until August 13, 2018 to advise the court whether he wishes to prosecute this action jointly. If plaintiffs decide to proceed with this action, then they must submit a signed complaint by August 13, 2018. Plaintif fs' motion for reconsideration, dkt. # 24 , is GRANTED. By August 13, 2018, plaintiffs must submit either (a) the full $400 filing fee, or (b) a certified trust fund account statement for the six-month period preceding the complaint for ea ch plaintiff. If, by August 13, 2018, any plaintiff fails to respond to this order as directed, that plaintiff will be considered to have withdrawn from the lawsuit voluntarily and will be dismissed from the case without being charged any portion of the $400 filing fee. Plaintiffs' motions for assistance in recruiting counsel, dkt. ## 16 , 18 , are DENIED without prejudice.Plaintiffs' motion to stay, dkt. # 25 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time, dkt. # 17 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 11.00 assessed for plaintiff Joshua Scolman. Plaintiff Scolman's initial partial filing fee due 8/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/18/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that each plaintiff has until July 23, 2018 to advise the court whether he wishes to prosecute this action jointly. If plaintiffs decide to proceed with this action, then they must submit (a) a signed complaint by July 23, 2018, a copy of whi ch is enclosed with this order; and (b) a certified trust fund account statement for the six month period preceding the complaint. The clerk of court is directed to return to Peg Swan the $400 check she submitted. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/2/2018. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scolman, Joshua et al v. Walker, Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua J. Scolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamau T.Z. Damali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jay Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Andrew Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sidney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burnett, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kallas, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAI Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens of CCI, WCI, GBCI and WSPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Directors at CCI, WCI, WSPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSU Directors at CCI, WCI, GBCI, WSPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSU Managers at CCI, WCI, GBCI, WSPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?