Garner, Oscar et al v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Defendant: Ryan D. Holzmacher, Nurse Jensen, Warden Foster, HSUM Marchant, Nurse Practitioner Tapio, Regina De Trana-Hinrichs, Nurse Gwendolyn and Food Service Manager Wilson
Undetermined: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv00552
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying plaintiff Oscar Garner's #11 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/14/2018. (jef),(ps)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Oscar Garner re #11 Motion / Memorandum for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B - Letters from Attorney Dawn Sabel) (nln),(ps)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Motion / Memorandum for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Oscar Garner. (nln),(ps)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 Exhibit 7 to #1 Complaint, filed by Oscar Garner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Inmate Complaint documents WCI-2018-14299) (elc),(ps)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (nln),(ps)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Regina De Trana-Hinrichs, Foster, Gwendolyn, Ryan D. Holzmacher, Jensen, Tapio, Wilson. (Barber, Timothy),(ps)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy M. Barber for Defendants Regina De Trana-Hinrichs, Foster, Gwendolyn, Ryan D. Holzmacher, Jensen, Tapio, Wilson, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Barber, Timothy),(ps)
August 13, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 34690032552. (jef),(ps)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER assessing Initial partial filing fee of $ 110.80. Initial partial filing fee due 8/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (elc),(ps)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Oscar Garner (elc),(ps)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Jensen, Ryan D. Holzmacher, Foster, Tapio, Gwendolyn, Wilson, Regina De Trana-Hinrichs. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Marchant. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Plaintiff may have until August 20, 2018, in which to submit a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/30/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Clerk's office letter to plaintiff regarding Exhibit 7 to complaint. (nln),(ps)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Plaintiff Oscar Garner re: this case being filed under "Imminent Danger of Serious Physical Injury." (nln),(ps)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Oscar Garner. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, 8-16 - Interview/Information Requests, Health Service Requests, UW Health Procedure Notes, Expert Report of Dr. Martin G. Prosky, captioned WDWI Case No. 11-cv-829-slc, #2 Cover Letter) (nln) Note: Per WCI e-filing librarian, there was no Exhibit 7 included with this filing.
July 17, 2018 PLRA 3-Strikes Screening. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner, Oscar et al v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. Holzmacher
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jensen
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Foster
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSUM Marchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Practitioner Tapio
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina De Trana-Hinrichs
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Gwendolyn
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Service Manager Wilson
Represented By: Timothy M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?